Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Workers' Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0052 (SB0616/CH0053)
Title
Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0303
Title
Harford County – Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Detention and Correctional Officers and Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767 (SB0619)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 /CH0332
Title
Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 /CH0495
Title
Subsequent Injury Fund and Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Assessment on Awards and Settlements – Amount
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330
Title
Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438
Title
Workers' Compensation Act - Death Benefits - Release of Claim
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616 /CH0053 (HB0099/CH0052)
Title
Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB0767)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Recruitment and Transparency Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 /CH0582
Title
Workers' Compensation - Hernia Claims
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0052 (SB0616/CH0053) Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 52
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0685 /CH0303 Harford County – Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Detention and Correctional Officers and Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Johnson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 303
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0767 (SB0619) Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0810 /CH0332 Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student Delegate Wivell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 332
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0005 Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0008 /CH0495 Subsequent Injury Fund and Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Assessment on Awards and Settlements – Amount Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0438 Workers' Compensation Act - Death Benefits - Release of Claim Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 /CH0053 (HB0099/CH0052) Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0619 (HB0767) Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 Labor and Employment - Fair Recruitment and Transparency Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 /CH0582 Workers' Compensation - Hernia Claims Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:52 PM