Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Wetlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160
Title
Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214 (SB0021)
Title
Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0417)
Title
Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799 (SB0442)
Title
Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 (HB0214)
Title
Wetlands and Waterways - Riparian Rights - Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0777)
Title
Power Plant Research Program - Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0799)
Title
Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0160 Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0214 (SB0021) Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Prohibition on Termination or Impairment Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0777 (SB0417) Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0799 (SB0442) Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0021 (HB0214) Wetlands and Waterways - Riparian Rights - Prohibition on Termination or Impairment Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0417 (HB0777) Power Plant Research Program - Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0442 (HB0799) Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:41 PM
Click to return on the top page