Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Benefits - Required Participation in the Individual Exchange by Carriers
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 /CH0116 (SB0530/CH0117)
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0267)
Title
AP Opportunities Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 (SB0990)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 (SB0452)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Out-of-Home Placement Data
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 /CH0457 (SB0787)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1363 /CH0460
Title
Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 /CH0470 (SB0875)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517
Title
Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 (HB0348)
Title
AP Opportunities Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0559)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 /CH0117 (HB0231/CH0116)
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1313/CH0457)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990 (HB0464)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0195 State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Benefits - Required Participation in the Individual Exchange by Carriers Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0231 /CH0116 (SB0530/CH0117) Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 116
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0348 (SB0267) AP Opportunities Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0458 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0464 (SB0990) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 (SB0452) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Out-of-Home Placement Data Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1313 /CH0457 (SB0787) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1363 /CH0460 Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission Delegate McKay 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 460
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 /CH0470 (SB0875) Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1517 Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
SB0267 (HB0348) AP Opportunities Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0452 (HB0559) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Senator McCray 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0530 /CH0117 (HB0231/CH0116) Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 117
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0680 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0787 (HB1313/CH0457) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0990 (HB0464) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:42 PM