Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Weather

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081 (SB0122)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB0462)
Title
Public Utilities – Low–Income Housing – Energy Performance Targets
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 (SB0062)
Title
Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 (SB0580)
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 (SB0676)
Title
Garrett County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296
Title
Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB0542)
Title
Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 (HB0081)
Title
Crimes – Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 (HB0295)
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462 (HB0379)
Title
Public Utilities - Low-Income Housing - Energy Performance Targets
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB0641)
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1128)
Title
Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 (SB0122) Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0379 (SB0462) Public Utilities – Low–Income Housing – Energy Performance Targets Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0542 (SB0062) Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0641 (SB0580) Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1128 (SB0676) Garrett County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1296 Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act) Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0062 (HB0542) Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0122 (HB0081) Crimes – Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0227 (HB0295) Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0462 (HB0379) Public Utilities - Low-Income Housing - Energy Performance Targets Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB0641) Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB1128) Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 7:49 PM
Click to return on the top page