Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weapons -see also- Guns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302
Title
Criminal Law - Deadly Weapons on School Property - Nonpublic Schools (No Weapons on Nonpublic School Property Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 (SB1066)
Title
Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221 (SB1029)
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261
Title
Weapon Crimes - Assault Long Guns and Copycat Weapons
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248
Title
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking and Attempted Armed Carjacking
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 (HB1130)
Title
Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925
Title
Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 (HB1568)
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029 (HB1221)
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 (HB1090)
Title
Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0302 Criminal Law - Deadly Weapons on School Property - Nonpublic Schools (No Weapons on Nonpublic School Property Act) Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0834 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 (SB1066) Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 (SB1029) Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1261 Weapon Crimes - Assault Long Guns and Copycat Weapons Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1309 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0248 Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking and Attempted Armed Carjacking Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0312 (HB1130) Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0943 (HB1568) Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0972 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1029 (HB1221) Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Complaints Against Law Enforcement Officers Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1066 (HB1090) Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 4:10 PM