Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Unemployment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946 /CH0383 (SB0847/CH0384)
Title
Child Support - Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Clean Energy and Energy Efficiency - Investment in Disadvantaged Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0926)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 /CH0384 (HB0946/CH0383)
Title
Child Support – Guidelines
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1425)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0647 Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 /CH0383 (SB0847/CH0384) Child Support - Guidelines Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 383
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1089 Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1206 Clean Energy and Energy Efficiency - Investment in Disadvantaged Communities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 (SB0926) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 /CH0384 (HB0946/CH0383) Child Support – Guidelines Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 384
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0926 (HB1425) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 3:57 PM