Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Tobacco and Nicotine

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0041 (SB0001/CH0042)
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 (SB0401)
Title
Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 (SB0177)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0239)
Title
St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771 (SB0548)
Title
Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 (SB0763)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 (SB0883)
Title
Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336 (SB0761)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0042 (HB0001/CH0041)
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 (HB0134)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 (HB0526)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273
Title
Electronic Smoking Device Regulation Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 (HB0104)
Title
Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB0771)
Title
Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 (HB1336)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0996)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1200)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1324)
Title
Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0041 (SB0001/CH0042) Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Appropriations
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0104 (SB0401) Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0134 (SB0177) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0526 (SB0239) St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0771 (SB0548) Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0996 (SB0763) Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021) Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB1324 (SB0883) Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
HB1336 (SB0761) State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0001 /CH0042 (HB0001/CH0041) Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Budget and Taxation
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/05/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0177 (HB0134) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0239 (HB0526) St. Mary's County - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0273 Electronic Smoking Device Regulation Act of 2021 Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0401 (HB0104) Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0548 (HB0771) Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0761 (HB1336) State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0763 (HB0996) Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0787 (HB1200) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0883 (HB1324) Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 9:47 AM
Click to return on the top page