Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tobacco and Nicotine

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003 (SB0233)
Title
Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900 /CH0359 (SB0911/CH0360)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 312-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369 (SB0821)
Title
Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Artificial or Natural Flavoring - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1594 (SB0440)
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0003)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321
Title
Policing Authority - Comptroller's Office and Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Flavor Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0440 (HB1594)
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508
Title
St. Mary's County - Possession of Tobacco Product or Electronic Smoking Device by an Individual Under the Age of 21 Years - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555
Title
Consumer Protection - Unit Pricing - Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1369)
Title
Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911 /CH0360 (HB0900/CH0359)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 (SB0233) Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Economic Matters
HB0732 Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
HB0900 /CH0359 (SB0911/CH0360) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications Delegate Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1283 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 312-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
HB1284 State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1369 (SB0821) Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Electronic Smoking Devices - Artificial or Natural Flavoring - Prohibition Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
HB1594 (SB0440) Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0003 Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0233 (HB0003) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 Policing Authority - Comptroller's Office and Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0410 Electronic Smoking Devices - Flavor Prohibition Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0440 (HB1594) Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0508 St. Mary's County - Possession of Tobacco Product or Electronic Smoking Device by an Individual Under the Age of 21 Years - Prohibition Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0555 Consumer Protection - Unit Pricing - Alcoholic Beverages Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0821 (HB1369) Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Finance)
Finance
Budget and Taxation
SB0911 /CH0360 (HB0900/CH0359) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 360
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0937 Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1075 Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/15/2020 4:32 PM