Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Theaters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322 /CH0167 (SB0612)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651 (SB0360)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147 (SB0401)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 (SB0577)
Title
Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1523
Title
Human Relations - Public Accommodations - Captioning in Movie Theaters (Open Captioning Equality Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0651)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 /CH0371 (HB0923/CH0370)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 (HB1147)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577 (HB1192)
Title
Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB0322/CH0167)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0322 /CH0167 (SB0612) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 167
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0651 (SB0360) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 370
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1147 (SB0401) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1192 (SB0577) Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1523 Human Relations - Public Accommodations - Captioning in Movie Theaters (Open Captioning Equality Act of 2020) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 (HB0651) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0385 /CH0371 (HB0923/CH0370) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 371
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0401 (HB1147) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0577 (HB1192) Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 (HB0322/CH0167) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/15/2020 3:06 PM