Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Solar Energy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0265)
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0559)
Title
Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 /CH0409 (SB0224/CH0410)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - Solar Energy Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 (SB0890)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 (SB0741)
Title
Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB0677)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0926)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426 (SB0739)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1472
Title
Baltimore City - Solar Panels on Commercial and Residential Structures - Prohibition on Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 /CH0410 (HB1029/CH0409)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0363)
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559 (HB0418)
Title
Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB1392)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 (HB1426)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB1390)
Title
Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 (HB1349)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1425)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1106)
Title
Property Tax - Solar Energy Systems
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 Solar Photovoltaic Recycling Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0363 (SB0265) Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0418 (SB0559) Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 /CH0409 (SB0224/CH0410) Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope Delegate Brooks 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
Economic Matters
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1106 (SB0954) Property Tax - Solar Energy Systems Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 (SB0890) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 (SB0741) Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 (SB0677) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1425 (SB0926) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1426 (SB0739) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1472 Baltimore City - Solar Panels on Commercial and Residential Structures - Prohibition on Limitation Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2020 - 1:30 PM
SB0224 /CH0410 (HB1029/CH0409) Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410
Finance
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0265 (HB0363) Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0559 (HB0418) Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 (HB1392) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0739 (HB1426) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0741 (HB1390) Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0890 (HB1349) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0926 (HB1425) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0954 (HB1106) Property Tax - Solar Energy Systems Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/17/2020 10:56 AM