Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sidewalks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0102 (SB0285/CH0103)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0512)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Local Governments - Responsibility for Repairing or Replacing Sidewalks
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483 (SB0874)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0103 (HB0194/CH0102)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0721)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 (HB1483)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0194 /CH0102 (SB0285/CH0103) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 102
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0615 Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0721 (SB0512) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1155 Local Governments - Responsibility for Repairing or Replacing Sidewalks Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1459 Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1483 (SB0874) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1604 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0065 Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 /CH0103 (HB0194/CH0102) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 103
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0512 (HB0721) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0874 (HB1483) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:30 PM