Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0454)
Title
Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234 (SB0607)
Title
Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499
Title
Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0059
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697
Title
Residential Property - Eviction Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754 (SB0617)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0898)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0018)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 (HB0234)
Title
Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 (HB0754)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1331)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0052 (SB0454) Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0234 (SB0607) Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0499 Rental Housing Restitution Fund - Establishment Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0574 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0670 /CH0059 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0697 Residential Property - Eviction Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0754 (SB0617) Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1331 (SB0898) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0154 (HB0018) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0328 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0607 (HB0234) Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0617 (HB0754) Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
SB0627 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (93-42)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0702 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
SB0898 (HB1331) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:36 PM
Click to return on the top page