Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Religion -see also- Places of Worship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140
Title
Commission on History, Culture, and Civics in Education
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 (SB0098)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223
Title
Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418
Title
County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Family Law - Removal of Child From Home - Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0891)
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency – Emergency Planning and Management Cultural Competency – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Labor and Employment - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0155)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543
Title
Insurance - Health Care Sharing Ministries - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 (HB1112)
Title
Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0140 Commission on History, Culture, and Civics in Education Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0155 (SB0098) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0223 Criminal Law – Person in a Position of Authority – Sexual Offenses With a Minor Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0418 County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Family Law - Removal of Child From Home - Meetings Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1046 Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1112 (SB0891) Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
HB1258 Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1276 Maryland Emergency Management Agency – Emergency Planning and Management Cultural Competency – Study Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1314 Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1321 Labor and Employment - Right to Work Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0098 (HB0155) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0543 Insurance - Health Care Sharing Ministries - Exemption Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 (HB1112) Public Health - Maternal and Child Mortality - Review and Perinatal Hospice Services Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 7:58 PM
Click to return on the top page