Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021
Title
Environment – Recycling – Prohibition on the Chemical Conversion of Plastic
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111
Title
Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 (SB0116)
Title
Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Rights and Restrictions - Composting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 (SB0483)
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 (SB0304)
Title
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807
Title
Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody and Reuse
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0650)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Task Force to Study Recycling and the Processing of Solid Waste
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 (HB0164)
Title
Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 (HB0280)
Title
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 (HB0264)
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB1094)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 Environment – Recycling – Prohibition on the Chemical Conversion of Plastic Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB0036 Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0099 Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0111 Environmental Justice - At-Risk Communities and Environmental Permits - Requirements Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0127 Maryland Paint Stewardship Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Hester)
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0164 (SB0116) Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0248 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Rights and Restrictions - Composting Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0264 (SB0483) Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0280 (SB0304) Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0807 Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody and Reuse Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0866 Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
HB1094 (SB0650) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1103 Task Force to Study Recycling and the Processing of Solid Waste Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1146 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0116 (HB0164) Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0304 (HB0280) Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
SB0483 (HB0264) Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0650 (HB1094) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Senator Klausmeier 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 12:20 PM
Click to return on the top page