Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0047
Title
St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 (SB0256)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077 /CH0421 (SB1056)
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 /CH0424 (SB0154/CH0423)
Title
Real Property – Recordation of Deeds – Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB1013)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 /CH0480
Title
Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0423 (HB1084/CH0424)
Title
Real Property - Recordation of Deeds - Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0529)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Report
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 /CH0566
Title
Real Property - Notice of Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recordation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013 (HB1149)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 (HB1077/CH0421)
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 /CH0047 St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 47
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0529 (SB0256) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments Delegate McIntosh 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1077 /CH0421 (SB1056) Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1084 /CH0424 (SB0154/CH0423) Real Property – Recordation of Deeds – Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 424
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1149 (SB1013) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1479 /CH0480 Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0016 Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0154 /CH0423 (HB1084/CH0424) Real Property - Recordation of Deeds - Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 423
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0256 (HB0529) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Report Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0570 /CH0566 Real Property - Notice of Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recordation Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1013 (HB1149) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1056 (HB1077/CH0421) Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/28/2020 11:07 AM