Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0102 (SB0285/CH0103)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 (SB0105)
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0645)
Title
Purple Line Construction Zone – State Income Tax Credit and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0253)
Title
Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transport
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0668)
Title
Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238
Title
Transportation - Magnetic Levitation Projects - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367
Title
Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1388 /CH0461
Title
Prince George’s County – Public Safety Surcharge PG 412–20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0062)
Title
Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543 (SB0912)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB1410)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 (HB0205)
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0715)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0103 (HB0194/CH0102)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB0540)
Title
State Income and Property Tax Credits - Purple Line Construction Zone
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 (HB0876)
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Transportation - Railroad Grade Crossing Over Private Road - Stop Sign
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB1543)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0163 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0194 /CH0102 (SB0285/CH0103) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 102
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0205 (SB0105) Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0540 (SB0645) Purple Line Construction Zone – State Income Tax Credit and Grant Program Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0715 (SB0253) Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transport Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0876 (SB0668) Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service Delegate Solomon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1238 Transportation - Magnetic Levitation Projects - Requirements Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1367 Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1388 /CH0461 Prince George’s County – Public Safety Surcharge PG 412–20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 461
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1410 (SB0062) Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1543 (SB0912) Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0062 (HB1410) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 (HB0205) Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0253 (HB0715) State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0285 /CH0103 (HB0194/CH0102) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 103
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0645 (HB0540) State Income and Property Tax Credits - Purple Line Construction Zone Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0668 (HB0876) Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0908 Transportation - Railroad Grade Crossing Over Private Road - Stop Sign Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 (HB1543) Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 4:03 PM