Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Racing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 /CH0093 (SB0286)
Title
Crimes Against Animals – Interference With Equines
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412
Title
Purse Dedication Account - Maryland Horse Industry Fund - Retired Racehorses
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0492
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 /CH0553 (HB0313)
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505
Title
Crimes Against Animals – Interference With Equines
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0171 /CH0093 (SB0286) Crimes Against Animals – Interference With Equines Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 93
Judiciary
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0266 Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0412 Purse Dedication Account - Maryland Horse Industry Fund - Retired Racehorses Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
SB0004 /CH0492 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0442 /CH0553 (HB0313) Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0505 Crimes Against Animals – Interference With Equines Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/23/2020 3:54 PM