Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0118
Title
Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting, Membership, and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 /CH0404 (SB0898)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Driver's License Verification and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033 /CH0411 (SB0778/CH0412)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0844)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Commercial Motor Carriers – Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH0427 (SB0885)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Electric Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
School Bus Purchasing – Zero–Emission Vehicle – Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127
Title
Vehicle Laws – Cats and Dogs Left Unattended – Authorized Removal
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 /CH0412 (HB1033/CH0411)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1036)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885 (HB1118/CH0427)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1013/CH0404)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Driver's License Verification and Records
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0232 /CH0118 Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting, Membership, and Sunset Extension Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 118
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1013 /CH0404 (SB0898) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Driver's License Verification and Records Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1033 /CH0411 (SB0778/CH0412) Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1036 (SB0844) Vehicle Laws – Commercial Motor Carriers – Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran’s Law) Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1118 /CH0427 (SB0885) Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 427
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1233 State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Electric Vehicles Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1451 School Bus Purchasing – Zero–Emission Vehicle – Requirement Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0127 Vehicle Laws – Cats and Dogs Left Unattended – Authorized Removal Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 253
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0778 /CH0412 (HB1033/CH0411) Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording Senator Ready 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0844 (HB1036) Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James's Law) Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0885 (HB1118/CH0427) Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1013/CH0404) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Driver's License Verification and Records Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:48 PM