Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Queen Anne's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 /CH0611 (SB0013)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurant Food Sales Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 /CH0215
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Financial Interest
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Inspector
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0217
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Petition of Support
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0794/CH0583)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0686
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Application on Behalf of Partnership
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1398 /CH0463
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 /CH0583 (HB0603)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0039 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0056 /CH0611 (SB0013) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0462 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurant Food Sales Requirements Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0463 /CH0215 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Financial Interest Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 215
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0466 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Inspector Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0467 /CH0217 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Petition of Support Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 217
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0468 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Employees Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0794/CH0583) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0686 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0690 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Application on Behalf of Partnership Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1353 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1398 /CH0463 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0794 /CH0583 (HB0603) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 2:18 PM