Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110
Title
Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0084
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Tax Revenue - Authorized Use
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 /CH0178 (SB0264/CH0179)
Title
Frederick County - Elderly or Disabled Renters - Grants
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 /CH0199
Title
St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 /CH0206
Title
Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0226
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 /CH0317
Title
Somerset County - Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787 /CH0327 (SB0354/CH0328)
Title
Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - Solar Energy Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0436 (SB0774/CH0437)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission – Community Benefits – Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189 (SB0063/CH0509)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 /CH0509 (HB1189)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 /CH0179 (HB0353/CH0178)
Title
Frederick County – Elderly or Disabled Renters – Grants
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0318
Title
Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 /CH0328 (HB0787/CH0327)
Title
Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0437 (HB1169/CH0436)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission – Community Benefits – Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1106)
Title
Property Tax - Solar Energy Systems
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0110 Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0155 /CH0084 St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Tax Revenue - Authorized Use St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 84
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0353 /CH0178 (SB0264/CH0179) Frederick County - Elderly or Disabled Renters - Grants Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 178
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0414 /CH0199 St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 199
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0434 /CH0206 Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 206
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0451 Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit Supplement Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 /CH0226 Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Delegate Metzgar 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 226
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0761 /CH0317 Somerset County - Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc. Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 317
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0787 /CH0327 (SB0354/CH0328) Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 327
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0798 Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1106 (SB0954) Property Tax - Solar Energy Systems Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 /CH0436 (SB0774/CH0437) Health Services Cost Review Commission – Community Benefits – Reporting Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 436
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1189 (SB0063/CH0509) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 /CH0509 (HB1189) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0264 /CH0179 (HB0353/CH0178) Frederick County – Elderly or Disabled Renters – Grants Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 179
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0352 /CH0318 Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc. Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0354 /CH0328 (HB0787/CH0327) Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 328
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0774 /CH0437 (HB1169/CH0436) Health Services Cost Review Commission – Community Benefits – Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 437
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0804 Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0954 (HB1106) Property Tax - Solar Energy Systems Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:41 PM