Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Public Works, Board of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010 (SB0044)
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Personal Care for Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB0148)
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 (SB0159)
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 (SB0442/CH0553)
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0276)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985 (SB0797)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Public–Private Partnerships – Highway and Bridge Toll Facilities – Rates (No Lexus Lane Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1424
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1573
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1655
Title
State Procurement - Concrete - Preference
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 (HB0010)
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0125)
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0207)
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB0338)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 /CH0553 (HB0313)
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 (HB0985)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0010 (SB0044) Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Personal Care for Adults Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0125 (SB0148) Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0207 (SB0159) Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 (SB0442/CH0553) Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0338 (SB0276) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
HB0985 (SB0797) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed (The Walter Lomax Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1220 Public–Private Partnerships – Highway and Bridge Toll Facilities – Rates (No Lexus Lane Act) Delegate Barve 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1249 I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1424 Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1573 State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1655 State Procurement - Concrete - Preference Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0044 (HB0010) Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2020 - 3:00 PM
SB0148 (HB0125) Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0159 (HB0207) Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0276 (HB0338) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 /CH0553 (HB0313) Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0797 (HB0985) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0918 Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:21 AM