Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Psychiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0541)
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0453)
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Children With Mental Disorders - List of Available Services
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB1053)
Title
Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 /CH0356
Title
Washington County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185
Title
Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities - Billing
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461
Title
Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical and Clinical Directors
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1652
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 (HB0374)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Children With Mental Disorders – List of Available Services
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0639 /CH0572 (HB1525)
Title
State Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel – Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB1486)
Title
Public Health - Non-Controlled Dangerous Substance Prescription Record System Program
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1053 (HB0611)
Title
Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0317 (SB0541) Mental Health - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 (SB0453) Behavioral Health Administration - Children With Mental Disorders - List of Available Services Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0611 (SB1053) Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0893 /CH0356 Washington County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 356
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1144 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1185 Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities - Billing Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1461 Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical and Clinical Directors Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1652 Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0453 (HB0374) Maryland Department of Health – Children With Mental Disorders – List of Available Services Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0639 /CH0572 (HB1525) State Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel – Compensation Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0752 (HB1486) Public Health - Non-Controlled Dangerous Substance Prescription Record System Program Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1053 (HB0611) Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:14 PM