Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 (SB0846)
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 /CH0132 (SB0210/CH0133)
Title
Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0134 (SB0227/CH0135)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 /CH0193
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764
Title
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 (SB0706)
Title
Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 /CH0347 (SB0249/CH0348)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0949)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0004)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0133 (HB0248/CH0132)
Title
Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 /CH0135 (HB0250/CH0134)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249 /CH0348 (HB0858/CH0347)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595
Title
Family Law – Protective Order – Rescission
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 (HB0126)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Workplace Violence and Study
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1231)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Study
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0126 (SB0846) Peace Orders - Workplace Violence Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0248 /CH0132 (SB0210/CH0133) Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 132
Judiciary
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0250 /CH0134 (SB0227/CH0135) Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 134
Judiciary
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0289 Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 /CH0193 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 193
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0744 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0764 Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity Delegate Williams 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0842 (SB0706) Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0858 /CH0347 (SB0249/CH0348) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Delegate McComas 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 347
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0949) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1352 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0004) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, and Transfers Senator Lee 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0210 /CH0133 (HB0248/CH0132) Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 133
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0227 /CH0135 (HB0250/CH0134) Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 135
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0249 /CH0348 (HB0858/CH0347) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Senator Cassilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0595 Family Law – Protective Order – Rescission Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0846 (HB0126) Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Workplace Violence and Study Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0949 (HB1231) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1071 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Study Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:32 PM