Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Property Developers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030 (SB0471)
Title
Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Annual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 /CH0186
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Only Marketplace License MC 11-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers - Common Amenities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080
Title
Coast Smart Siting and Design Criteria - Private Construction or Reconstruction Projects - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207
Title
Electric Companies – Conduit Installation – Single–Family Detached Developments
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406
Title
Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567 (SB0715)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0030)
Title
Condominiums - Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments by Developers (Sunset Island Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543
Title
Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Number of Declarant Votes
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB1567)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 (SB0471) Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0218 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Annual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0377 /CH0186 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Only Marketplace License MC 11-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 186
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1053 Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1070 Maryland Condominium Act - Implied Warranties From Developers - Common Amenities Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1080 Coast Smart Siting and Design Criteria - Private Construction or Reconstruction Projects - Application Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1207 Electric Companies – Conduit Installation – Single–Family Detached Developments Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1406 Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1567 (SB0715) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0471 (HB0030) Condominiums - Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments by Developers (Sunset Island Act) Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0543 Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Number of Declarant Votes Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0715 (HB1567) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:18 PM