Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 (SB0316)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Alterations and Compliance Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0835)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1356
Title
Blue Ribbon Solar Land Use Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316 (HB0467)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB0803)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0467 (SB0316) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Alterations and Compliance Fees Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB0803 (SB0835) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1356 Blue Ribbon Solar Land Use Commission Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1362 Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0316 (HB0467) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Feldman)
Finance
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0835 (HB0803) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 7:23 PM
Click to return on the top page