Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Places of Worship -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Powers Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 (SB0855)
Title
Queen Anne’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0826)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distance Restrictions PG 304-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 (SB0453)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061 (SB0832)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 (HB0637)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB0538)
Title
Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1061)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0323)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 Public Safety - Emergency Powers Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0323 (SB0855) Queen Anne’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0538 (SB0826) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distance Restrictions PG 304-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0637 (SB0453) Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1061 (SB0832) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0453 (HB0637) Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0826 (HB0538) Handgun Permits – Qualifications – High–Risk Occupations Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0832 (HB1061) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0855 (HB0323) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Place of Worship Prohibition Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 9:30 PM
Click to return on the top page