Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Physician Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 /CH0187 (SB0304/CH0188)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 (SB0726/CH0578)
Title
Education - School Physical Examinations - Physician Assistant
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Health Occupations - Primary Care Providers - Adverse Childhood Experiences Screening
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 /CH0290
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Out-of-State Pharmacists and Discipline for Noncompliance
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998 /CH0402 (SB0501/CH0403)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1502
Title
Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 (SB0639/CH0572)
Title
Maryland Department of Health and Motor Vehicle Administration - Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1564 /CH0488
Title
Public Health - Emergency Evaluations - Duties of Peace Officers and Emergency Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 /CH0188 (HB0378/CH0187)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 /CH0403 (HB0998/CH0402)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 /CH0578 (HB0497)
Title
Education - School Physical Examinations - Physician Assistant
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788
Title
Income Tax – Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0378 /CH0187 (SB0304/CH0188) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0497 (SB0726/CH0578) Education - School Physical Examinations - Physician Assistant Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0628 Health Occupations - Primary Care Providers - Adverse Childhood Experiences Screening Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0663 /CH0290 Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Out-of-State Pharmacists and Discipline for Noncompliance Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 290
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0998 /CH0402 (SB0501/CH0403) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1502 Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1525 (SB0639/CH0572) Maryland Department of Health and Motor Vehicle Administration - Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1564 /CH0488 Public Health - Emergency Evaluations - Duties of Peace Officers and Emergency Facilities Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0304 /CH0188 (HB0378/CH0187) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 188
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0501 /CH0403 (HB0998/CH0402) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding Senator Griffith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0726 /CH0578 (HB0497) Education - School Physical Examinations - Physician Assistant Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0788 Income Tax – Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/16/2020 1:41 PM