Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Personal Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229
Title
Corporate Income Tax – Throwback Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 (SB0841)
Title
Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardian of Property of Minor or Disabled Person - Prohibition on Distribution or Disbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257
Title
Business Personal Property Tax – Businesses Affected by COVID–19 Restrictions – Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320
Title
Baltimore City - Property Taxes - Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511
Title
Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB0954)
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0229 Corporate Income Tax – Throwback Rule Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0954 (SB0841) Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1000 Estates and Trusts - Guardian of Property of Minor or Disabled Person - Prohibition on Distribution or Disbursement Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1257 Business Personal Property Tax – Businesses Affected by COVID–19 Restrictions – Reimbursement Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1320 Baltimore City - Property Taxes - Authority to Set Special Rates Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0328 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0511 Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0841 (HB0954) Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/6/2021 1:56 PM
Click to return on the top page