Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 (SB0010)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0301)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits
Sponsor
Chair, Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0168 (SB0961/CH0169)
Title
Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
General Assembly - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818
Title
Redistricting and Apportionment - Population Count - Citizenship Status
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832
Title
General Assembly - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 (SB0302)
Title
Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
General Assembly - Environmental Impact Statements - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1570 (SB1009)
Title
State Budget - Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1660
Title
General Assembly - Legislative Privilege - Exception for Records Related to a Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008
Title
United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0011
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0103)
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 (HB0324)
Title
State Government – Office of Legislative Audits – Costs of Audits
Sponsor
Chair, Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0302 (HB0840)
Title
Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 /CH0627
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 /CH0628
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0961 /CH0169 (HB0325/CH0168)
Title
Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 (HB1570)
Title
State Budget - Relief From Budget Mandates
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 (SB0010) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0324 (SB0301) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits Chair, Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0325 /CH0168 (SB0961/CH0169) Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 168
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0366 General Assembly - Term Limits Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0818 Redistricting and Apportionment - Population Count - Citizenship Status Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0832 General Assembly - Term Limits Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0840 (SB0302) Joint Committee on Workforce Development Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 General Assembly - Environmental Impact Statements - Pilot Program Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1570 (SB1009) State Budget - Relief From Budget Mandates Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1660 General Assembly - Legislative Privilege - Exception for Records Related to a Crime Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0008 United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HJ0011 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0010 (HB0103) General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0301 (HB0324) State Government – Office of Legislative Audits – Costs of Audits Chair, Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0302 (HB0840) Joint Committee on Workforce Development Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0748 /CH0627 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Rules
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0749 /CH0628 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Rules
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0961 /CH0169 (HB0325/CH0168) Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 169
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1009 (HB1570) State Budget - Relief From Budget Mandates President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:46 PM