Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Organ Donorship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944 (SB0651)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1133 (SB0869)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 (HB0944)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1133)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917
Title
Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0944 (SB0651) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1133 (SB0869) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0651 (HB0944) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0869 (HB1133) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0917 Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 11:32 AM