Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Opioids -see also- Controlled Dangerous Substances; Drugs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Center Patients - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 (SB0399)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Prescribers of Opioids – Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Program Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 (HB0947)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0946 Maryland Transit Administration - Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Center Patients - Modifications Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0947 (SB0399) Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Modifications Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1125 Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Prescribers of Opioids – Notification Requirement Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0184 Maryland Transit Administration – Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Program Requirements Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0399 (HB0947) Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients - Modifications Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2021 7:48 PM
Click to return on the top page