Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ombudsmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0590)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614 (SB0460)
Title
State Government - Office of the Environmental and Natural Resources Ombudsman - Establishment (Environmental Accountability and Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0504/CH0562)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733 (SB0526)
Title
Transportation - Private Sector Transportation Projects Ombudsman - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975
Title
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Ombudsmen
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010
Title
Health Care Facilities – Discrimination (LGBTQ Senior Bill of Rights)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0440
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0614)
Title
State Government – Environmental and Natural Resources Ombudsman – Establishment (Environmental Accountability and Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 /CH0562 (HB0699)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0526 (HB0733)
Title
Transportation - Private Sector Transportation Projects Ombudsman - Established
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB0502)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681
Title
Electricity Suppliers and Gas Suppliers - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0502 (SB0590) Public Information Act - Revisions Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0614 (SB0460) State Government - Office of the Environmental and Natural Resources Ombudsman - Establishment (Environmental Accountability and Transparency Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 (SB0504/CH0562) Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0733 (SB0526) Transportation - Private Sector Transportation Projects Ombudsman - Established Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Ombudsmen Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1010 Health Care Facilities – Discrimination (LGBTQ Senior Bill of Rights) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1181 /CH0440 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0460 (HB0614) State Government – Environmental and Natural Resources Ombudsman – Establishment (Environmental Accountability and Transparency Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0504 /CH0562 (HB0699) Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0526 (HB0733) Transportation - Private Sector Transportation Projects Ombudsman - Established Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 (HB0502) Public Information Act - Revisions Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 Electricity Suppliers and Gas Suppliers - Consumer Protections Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:12 PM