Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Occupational Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 /CH0308 (SB0434)
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0934 /CH0375 (SB0838/CH0376)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0062)
Title
Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Environment - Higher Education Facilities - Mold Hazards and Mold or Moisture Problems
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475 (SB0992)
Title
School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB1410)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools – Electric Retractable Room Partitions – Operation Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0722/CH0308)
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438
Title
Workers' Compensation Act - Death Benefits - Release of Claim
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838 /CH0376 (HB0934/CH0375)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB1475)
Title
School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0612 Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Program - Revisions Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 /CH0308 (SB0434) Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 308
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0934 /CH0375 (SB0838/CH0376) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System Delegate Jackson, M. 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1410 (SB0062) Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Environment - Higher Education Facilities - Mold Hazards and Mold or Moisture Problems Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1475 (SB0992) School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0062 (HB1410) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 Public and Nonpublic Schools – Electric Retractable Room Partitions – Operation Requirements Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0434 (HB0722/CH0308) Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 Workers' Compensation Act - Death Benefits - Release of Claim Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 /CH0376 (HB0934/CH0375) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System Senator Kagan 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0992 (HB1475) School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act) Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 3:58 PM