Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 /CH0182
Title
Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 /CH0230
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0279 (SB0444/CH0280)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 (SB0897)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Training Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 (SB0959)
Title
Public Health – Demonstration Program Developmental Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Nursing Home Administrators - License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Compliance with State Labor Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416 (SB0820)
Title
Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540 (SB1067)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 /CH0229
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0280 (HB0631/CH0279)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 (HB0707)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1416)
Title
Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 (HB1168)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Training Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB1171)
Title
Public Health – Demonstration Program and Developmental Disabilities
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1067 (HB1540)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0364 /CH0182 Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement Delegate Saab 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 182
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0512 /CH0230 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0631 /CH0279 (SB0444/CH0280) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership Delegate Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 279
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0692 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 (SB0897) Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Training Requirements Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 (SB0959) Public Health – Demonstration Program Developmental Disabilities Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 Nursing Home Administrators - License Requirements Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1415 Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Compliance with State Labor Laws Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1416 (SB0820) Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020) Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1540 (SB1067) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0166 /CH0229 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 229
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0444 /CH0280 (HB0631/CH0279) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 280
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0480 (HB0707) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0511 Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 (HB1416) Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0897 (HB1168) Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Training Requirements Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0959 (HB1171) Public Health – Demonstration Program and Developmental Disabilities Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
SB1067 (HB1540) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:51 PM