Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Notaries Public

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 /CH0571
Title
Maryland Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts – Requirements for Appointment as a Notary Public – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0661 State Government - Notaries Public - Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0744 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0636 /CH0571 Maryland Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts – Requirements for Appointment as a Notary Public – Alterations Senator Jennings 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:19 PM