Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0129)
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081 (SB0122)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0217)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0016)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392
Title
Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 (SB0495)
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving – Death of Another – Must–Appear Violation (Sherry’s and Ryan’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0828
Title
Good Teacher Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 (SB0017)
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 (HB0218)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 (HB0855)
Title
Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 (HB0081)
Title
Crimes – Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 (HB0054)
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 (HB0117)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 (HB0668)
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 (SB0129) Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0081 (SB0122) Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0117 (SB0217) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0218 (SB0016) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0302 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0392 Family Child Care Homes, Large Family Child Care Homes, and Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0420 Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0668 (SB0495) Reckless and Negligent Driving – Death of Another – Must–Appear Violation (Sherry’s and Ryan’s Law) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0828 Good Teacher Protection Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0855 (SB0017) Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law) Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0016 (HB0218) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0017 (HB0855) Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law) Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0122 (HB0081) Crimes – Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0129 (HB0054) Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0217 (HB0117) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0495 (HB0668) Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page