Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Murder

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089 (SB0397)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0626)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 (SB0046)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0187)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0395)
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115
Title
Criminal Law – Felony Murder – Limitations and Review
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0853)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 (HB0231)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 (HB0240)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB0385)
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0139)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1187)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Council Extension and Grant Funding
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0089 (SB0397) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0139 (SB0626) Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0231 (SB0046) Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0240 (SB0187) Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0385 (SB0395) Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1029 Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1115 Criminal Law – Felony Murder – Limitations and Review Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1187 (SB0853) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0046 (HB0231) Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0187 (HB0240) Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0395 (HB0385) Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2021 - 12:30 PM
SB0626 (HB0139) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0853 (HB1187) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Council Extension and Grant Funding Senator Carter 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page