Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Repair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0734)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0068
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0086
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Farm Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0844)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Commercial Motor Carriers – Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 /CH0417 (SB0813/CH0418)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 (HB0111)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 /CH0418 (HB1064/CH0417)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1036)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0111 (SB0734) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB0133 /CH0068 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 68
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0158 /CH0086 Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0799 Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Farm Equipment Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 (SB0844) Vehicle Laws – Commercial Motor Carriers – Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James Cohran’s Law) Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1064 /CH0417 (SB0813/CH0418) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 417
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1418 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1505 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0734 (HB0111) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB0813 /CH0418 (HB1064/CH0417) Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 418
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0844 (HB1036) Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Carriers - Safety, Maintenance, and Insurance Information (James's Law) Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:43 PM