Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0086
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0090
Title
Harford County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0270 (SB1021)
Title
Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632 (SB1054)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0512)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920
Title
Motor Vehicles - Motorcycles - Overtaking and Passing Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0721)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB0600/CH0270)
Title
Baltimore County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB0632)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration - Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0158 /CH0086 Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0164 /CH0090 Harford County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0600 /CH0270 (SB1021) Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 270
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 (SB1054) Vehicle Laws - Registration - Renewal Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0721 (SB0512) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0920 Motor Vehicles - Motorcycles - Overtaking and Passing Vehicles Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1263 Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1459 Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0237 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 (HB0721) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 253
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1021 (HB0600/CH0270) Baltimore County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1054 (HB0632) Vehicle Laws - Registration - Renewal Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:04 PM