Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mortgages

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025 /CH0032 (SB0293/CH0033)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 /CH0163
Title
Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Exception for Government Junior Mortgages
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 (SB0262)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 (SB0758)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 (SB0568)
Title
Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program
Sponsor
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0675)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB1013)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519
Title
Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0334)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0033 (HB0025/CH0032)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0815)
Title
Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program
Sponsor
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621
Title
Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Considerations of a Mortgage Servicer - Borrower's Ability to Repay
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0990)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB0401)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013 (HB1149)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0025 /CH0032 (SB0293/CH0033) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0314 /CH0163 Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Exception for Government Junior Mortgages Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 163
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0334 (SB0262) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0401 (SB0758) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0444 Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 (SB0568) Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 (SB0675) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 (SB1013) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1519 Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Fees Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2020 - 3:00 PM
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0262 (HB0334) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 /CH0033 (HB0025/CH0032) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0568 (HB0815) Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness 6 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0621 Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Considerations of a Mortgage Servicer - Borrower's Ability to Repay Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB0990) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0758 (HB0401) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1013 (HB1149) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:17 PM