Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims - Expert Witnesses
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 /CH0385 (SB0169/CH0386)
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169 /CH0386 (HB0947/CH0385)
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0684 Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims - Expert Witnesses Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 /CH0385 (SB0169/CH0386) Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate Cullison 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
SB0169 /CH0386 (HB0947/CH0385) Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
SB0187 Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:27 PM