Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0631
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland-National Capital Park Police and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Force PG/MC 105-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0185
Title
Bicounty Commissions - Annual Reports - Conflicts of Interest and Lobbying PG/MC 102-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review PG/MC 101-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program - Study PG/MC 108-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0276 /CH0631 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland-National Capital Park Police and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Force PG/MC 105-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631
Ways and Means
2/07/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0370 /CH0185 Bicounty Commissions - Annual Reports - Conflicts of Interest and Lobbying PG/MC 102-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 185
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0394 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review PG/MC 101-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (126-7)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program - Study PG/MC 108-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1249 I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:46 PM