Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0324 (SB0988/CH0325)
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Howard County – Residential Property and New Home Construction Advertisements – School District Information Ho. Co. 02–20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0536)
Title
Divorce and Annulment - Removal of Barriers to Remarriage
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120 /CH0428 (SB0738)
Title
Health Care Providers – Discrimination in Provision of Services
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204 (SB0993)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0949)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Family Law – Removal of Child From Home – Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0467
Title
Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1561
Title
Discriminatory Housing Practices - Intent
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 (HB0833)
Title
Divorce and Annulment - Removal of Barriers to Remarriage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 /CH0570
Title
Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB1120/CH0428)
Title
Health Care Providers and Health Benefit Plans - Discrimination in Provision of Services
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1231)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0988 /CH0325 (HB0781/CH0324)
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0458 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0781 /CH0324 (SB0988/CH0325) Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 324
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0826 Howard County – Residential Property and New Home Construction Advertisements – School District Information Ho. Co. 02–20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0833 (SB0536) Divorce and Annulment - Removal of Barriers to Remarriage Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 /CH0428 (SB0738) Health Care Providers – Discrimination in Provision of Services Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1204 (SB0993) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1231 (SB0949) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1342 Family Law – Removal of Child From Home – Meetings Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 /CH0467 Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 467
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1561 Discriminatory Housing Practices - Intent Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0536 (HB0833) Divorce and Annulment - Removal of Barriers to Remarriage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0628 /CH0570 Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Finance
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0680 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0738 (HB1120/CH0428) Health Care Providers and Health Benefit Plans - Discrimination in Provision of Services Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0949 (HB1231) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0988 /CH0325 (HB0781/CH0324) Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 325
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:28 PM