Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Literacy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Hangul Day
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140 (SB0056)
Title
Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Plain Language Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508
Title
Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0272 (SB0326/CH0273)
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644 (SB0617)
Title
State Department of Education - Financial Literacy Instruction - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 (SB0575)
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946 /CH0383 (SB0847/CH0384)
Title
Child Support - Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 (SB0760/CH0581)
Title
Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499
Title
Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0140)
Title
Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Plain Language Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 /CH0273 (HB0604/CH0272)
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 (HB0718)
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 (HB0644)
Title
State Department of Education - Financial Literacy Instruction - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 /CH0581 (HB1173)
Title
Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 /CH0384 (HB0946/CH0383)
Title
Child Support – Guidelines
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Hangul Day Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0140 (SB0056) Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Plain Language Requirement Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0508 Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0604 /CH0272 (SB0326/CH0273) State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Ways and Means
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0644 (SB0617) State Department of Education - Financial Literacy Instruction - Reporting Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 (SB0575) State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0946 /CH0383 (SB0847/CH0384) Child Support - Guidelines Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 383
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1173 (SB0760/CH0581) Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1499 Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 (HB0140) Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Plain Language Requirement Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0326 /CH0273 (HB0604/CH0272) State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0575 (HB0718) State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 (HB0644) State Department of Education - Financial Literacy Instruction - Reporting Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0760 /CH0581 (HB1173) Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0847 /CH0384 (HB0946/CH0383) Child Support – Guidelines Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 384
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:15 AM