Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021 /CH0028 (SB0088/CH0029)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0097
Title
Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 /CH0163
Title
Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Exception for Government Junior Mortgages
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 (SB0758)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033 /CH0411 (SB0778/CH0412)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB1013)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0435
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Tax - Authorization
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0440
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0441 (SB0806/CH0442)
Title
Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519
Title
Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0300 (HB0676/CH0299)
Title
Real Property - Recording Costs - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB0401)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 /CH0412 (HB1033/CH0411)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0806 /CH0442 (HB1182/CH0441)
Title
Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013 (HB1149)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 /CH0028 (SB0088/CH0029) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0177 /CH0097 Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0314 /CH0163 Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Exception for Government Junior Mortgages Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 163
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0401 (SB0758) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1033 /CH0411 (SB0778/CH0412) Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1149 (SB1013) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1161 /CH0435 Washington County - Mobile Home Tax - Authorization Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 435
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1181 /CH0440 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1182 /CH0441 (SB0806/CH0442) Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents Delegate Smith 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1320 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1519 Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0016 Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
SB0291 /CH0300 (HB0676/CH0299) Real Property - Recording Costs - Exemption Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 300
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0758 (HB0401) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0778 /CH0412 (HB1033/CH0411) Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording Senator Ready 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0806 /CH0442 (HB1182/CH0441) Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents Senator Hayes 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1013 (HB1149) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/17/2020 11:05 AM