Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Workers' Compensation (K1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0052 (SB0616/CH0053)
Title
Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0303
Title
Harford County – Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Detention and Correctional Officers and Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767 (SB0619)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 /CH0332
Title
Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 /CH0495
Title
Subsequent Injury Fund and Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Assessment on Awards and Settlements – Amount
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438
Title
Workers' Compensation Act - Death Benefits - Release of Claim
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616 /CH0053 (HB0099/CH0052)
Title
Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB0767)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 /CH0582
Title
Workers' Compensation - Hernia Claims
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0052 (SB0616/CH0053) Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 52
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0685 /CH0303 Harford County – Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Detention and Correctional Officers and Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Johnson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 303
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0767 (SB0619) Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0810 /CH0332 Workers' Compensation - Washington County - Volunteer Company - Fire and Rescue Academy Student Delegate Wivell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 332
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0008 /CH0495 Subsequent Injury Fund and Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Assessment on Awards and Settlements – Amount Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 Workers' Compensation Act - Death Benefits - Release of Claim Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 /CH0053 (HB0099/CH0052) Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0619 (HB0767) Workers' Compensation - Fees for Legal Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 /CH0582 Workers' Compensation - Hernia Claims Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:27 PM