Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Judicial Review -see also- Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 (SB0758)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 (SB0910)
Title
Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 (SB0919)
Title
Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1595 (SB0853)
Title
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0010
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 (HB0707)
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB0401)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1051)
Title
Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1308)
Title
Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0401 (SB0758) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0592 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1051 (SB0910) Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 (SB0919) Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 /CH0459 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners Delegate Anderton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1595 (SB0853) Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0251 /CH0010 Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0480 (HB0707) State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0758 (HB0401) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0910 (HB1051) Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0919 (HB1308) Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:34 PM