Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034 (SB0087)
Title
Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Hangul Day
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0100 (SB0167/CH0101)
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392
Title
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 (SB0451)
Title
Secretary of State - Duties - International Friendship Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677 (SB0850)
Title
Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906 (SB0620)
Title
Pongal Day
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1487 (SB0986)
Title
Public Schools - Agricultural Education and Grant Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB1044)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001
Title
Declaration of a Climate Emergency and Implementation of a Climate Mobilization Effort
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0001/JR0001)
Title
2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 (HB0034)
Title
Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 /CH0101 (HB0189/CH0100)
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 (HB0585)
Title
Secretary of State - Duties - International Friendship Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0906)
Title
Pongal Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0677)
Title
Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1487)
Title
Public Schools – Agricultural Education and Grant Programs
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044 (HB1592)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 /JR0001 (HJ0007)
Title
2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 (SB0087) Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2020 - 1:15 PM
HB0122 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Hangul Day Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0189 /CH0100 (SB0167/CH0101) Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0392 Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0585 (SB0451) Secretary of State - Duties - International Friendship Agreements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0677 (SB0850) Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 (SB0620) Pongal Day Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1487 (SB0986) Public Schools - Agricultural Education and Grant Programs Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1592 (SB1044) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0001 Declaration of a Climate Emergency and Implementation of a Climate Mobilization Effort Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
HJ0007 (SJ0001/JR0001) 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0087 (HB0034) Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0167 /CH0101 (HB0189/CH0100) Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 101
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0451 (HB0585) Secretary of State - Duties - International Friendship Agreements Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0620 (HB0906) Pongal Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 (HB0677) Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0986 (HB1487) Public Schools – Agricultural Education and Grant Programs Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1044 (HB1592) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0001 /JR0001 (HJ0007) 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Joint Resolution 1
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:20 PM