Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Home Detention

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0356)
Title
Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377 (SB0513)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356 (HB0813)
Title
Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB1377)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0813 (SB0356) Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1137 Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1377 (SB0513) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0356 (HB0813) Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0513 (HB1377) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0698 Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:31 PM