Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

State Highway Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0905)
Title
State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 /CH0102 (SB0285/CH0103)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception - City of Havre de Grace
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 /CH0114 (SB0199/CH0115)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0147
Title
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 306-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Department of the Environment, Department of Transportation, and State Highway Administration - Permits With Impact Studies - Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0103 (HB0194/CH0102)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 /CH0585
Title
State Highway Administration - Electronic Signs Along Highways - Suicide Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854
Title
Baltimore City – Speed Limits – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905 (HB0084)
Title
State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Transportation - Railroad Grade Crossing Over Private Road - Stop Sign
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 (SB0905) State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0194 /CH0102 (SB0285/CH0103) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 102
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0217 Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception - City of Havre de Grace Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0230 /CH0114 (SB0199/CH0115) Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles Delegate Wells 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 114
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0275 /CH0147 Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 306-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 147
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1212 Department of the Environment, Department of Transportation, and State Highway Administration - Permits With Impact Studies - Hearings Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1262 Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0285 /CH0103 (HB0194/CH0102) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 103
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0810 /CH0585 State Highway Administration - Electronic Signs Along Highways - Suicide Prevention Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0854 Baltimore City – Speed Limits – Establishment Senator Sydnor 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0855 Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83 Senator Sydnor 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0905 (HB0084) State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0908 Transportation - Railroad Grade Crossing Over Private Road - Stop Sign Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 5:52 PM